|
09/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 531, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4757.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 7. Page 6298.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6155.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3608.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|