LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1298
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1298
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1298
Compare Versions
SB1298 Chaptered September 21, 2014
SB1298 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1298 Amended August 19, 2014
SB1298 Amended June 17, 2014
SB1298 Amended May 7, 2014
SB1298 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1298 Chaptered September 21, 2014
SB1298 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1298 Amended August 19, 2014
SB1298 Amended June 17, 2014
SB1298 Amended May 7, 2014
SB1298 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare