|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 528, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3280.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3189.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2950.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 447.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 144.) (February 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|