California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill September 11, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill February 6, 2013