Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 20. Page 6337.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3652.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3342.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3093.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|