California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 29, 2014
Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014