|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 375, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5013.) Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4979.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6548.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 6317.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6346.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3257.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|