California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1323 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014