BILL NUMBER: SB 1323AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 17, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 29, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 25, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lieu FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 5157 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1323, as amended, Lieu. Specialized license plates: Pet Lover's License Plate Program. Existing law establishes a specialized license plate program and requires the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to issue specialized license plates to a sponsoring state agency that meets certain requirements. Existing law requires the DMV to charge specified additional fees for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of specialized license plates, and requires that these additional fees, less the DMV's administrative costs, be deposited in the Specialized License Plate Fund for appropriation and allocation to each sponsoring state agency, as specified. This bill would require the DMV to deposit the additional fees, less the DMV's administrative costs, for a specialized license plate issued under the Pet Lover's License Plate Program sponsored by the Veterinary Medical Board, or a successor specialized license plate program sponsored by the board, into the Pet Lover's Specialized License Plate Fund, which the bill would establish. The bill would require that these funds be continuously appropriated appropriate the moneys in the Specialized L icense Plate Fund derived from the issuance, renewal, transfer, and substitution of a specialized license plate issued under the Pet Lover's License Plate Program sponsored by the Veterinary Medical Board prior to the operative date of the bill to the Veterinary Medical Board for the sole and exclusive purpose of funding grants to providers of no-cost or low-cost animal sterilization services, as specified. By continuously appropriating moneys in the fund to the board, the bill would make an appropriation. services. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Any moneys in the Specialized License Plate Fund derived from the issuance, renewal, transfer, and substitution of a specialized license plate issued under the Pet Lover's License Plate Program sponsored by the Veterinary Medical Board prior to the operative date of Senate Bill 1323 of the 2013-14 Regular Session are hereby appropriated to the Veterinary Medical Board for the sole and exclusive purpose of funding grants to providers of no-cost or low-cost animal sterilization services. SECTION 1. Section 5157 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 5157. (a) In addition to the regular fees for an original registration or renewal of registration, the following additional fees shall be paid for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plates: (1) For the original issuance of the plates, fifty dollars ($50). (2) For a renewal of registration with the plates, forty dollars ($40). (3) For transfer of the plates to another vehicle, fifteen dollars ($15). (4) For each substitute replacement plate, thirty-five dollars ($35). (5) In addition, for the issuance of environmental license plates, as defined in Section 5103, with a specialized license plate design, the additional fees prescribed in Sections 5106 and 5108. The additional fees prescribed in Sections 5106 and 5108 shall be deposited in the California Environmental License Plate Fund. (b) The Gold Star Family specialized license plate program as provided in subdivision (d) of Section 5156 shall not be subject to the fees specified in paragraphs (1), (2), and (5) of subdivision (a) and shall only be issued in a sequential series. (c) Except as provided in paragraph (5) of subdivision (a), and after deducting its administrative costs under this section, the department shall deposit the additional revenue derived from the issuance, renewal, transfer, and substitution of the specialized license plates in the Specialized License Plate Fund, which is hereby established in the State Treasury. Upon appropriation by the Legislature, the moneys in that fund shall be allocated to each sponsoring agency, in proportion to the amount in the fund that is attributable to the agency's specialized license plate program. Except as authorized under Section 5159, the sponsoring agency shall expend all funds received under this section exclusively for projects and programs that promote the state agency's official policy, mission, or work. (d) (1) The Department of Veterans Affairs may actively request and receive donations for the Gold Star Family License Plate Account, which is hereby created in the Specialized License Plate Fund and which may consist of donations from public and private entities. Earnings generated by the Gold Star Family License Plate Account shall be retained by the account. (2) Upon the determination of the department that there are sufficient funds in the Gold Star Family License Plate Account for this purpose, moneys in the Gold Star Family License Plate Account shall be available, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to the department for the necessary administrative costs of establishing the Gold Star Family specialized license plate program. (e) (1) Notwithstanding subdivision (c) and except as provided in paragraph (5) of subdivision (a), after deducting its administrative costs under this section, the department shall deposit the additional revenue derived from the issuance, renewal, transfer, and substitution of a specialized license plate issued under the Pet Lover's License Plate Program sponsored by the Veterinary Medical Board, or a successor specialized license plate program sponsored by the Veterinary Medical Board, in the Pet Lover's Specialized License Plate Fund, which is hereby established in the State Treasury. (2) Any moneys in the Specialized License Plate Fund derived from the issuance, renewal, transfer, and substitution of a specialized license plate issued under the Pet Lover's License Plate Program sponsored by the Veterinary Medical Board prior to the operative date of Senate Bill 1323 of the 2013-14 Regular Session shall be transferred to the Pet Lover's Specialized License Plate Fund. (3) Notwithstanding Section 13340 of the Government Code, all of the moneys in the Pet Lover's Specialized License Plate Fund are continuously appropriated to the Veterinary Medical Board, without regard to fiscal years, for the sole and exclusive purpose of funding grants to providers of no-cost or low-cost animal sterilization services. (4) The Veterinary Medical Board shall adopt regulations that govern the Pet Lover's License Plate Program and specify the manner in which moneys in the Pet Lover's Specialized License Plate Fund are awarded consistent with this subdivision. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that funds from a specialized license plate program are available as soon as possible to allow the Veterinary Medical Board to support the critically important efforts of city and county animal shelters to address serious animal care and control problems facing the state, it is necessary that this act go into effect immediately.