|
08/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 226, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4403.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5905.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3361.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3078.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|