California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1326 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014