|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6025.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3464.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3308.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|