California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill June 30, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014