Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5692.) Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 3413.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3235.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|