California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1348 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 23, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014
Bill March 26, 2014