|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 520, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6413.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported from committee on June 25, 2014. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3079.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|