California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014