|
09/30/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4475.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5907.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3269.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3234.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|