California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill August 7, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014