|
09/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 525, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4911.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 6488.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported from committee on June 25, 2014. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 3692.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3295.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|