California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014