|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2282.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3012.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1164.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1007.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 421.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|