California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013
Bill March 13, 2013