California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014