LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1383
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1383
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1383
Compare Versions
SB1383 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB1383 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1383 Amended June 16, 2014
SB1383 Amended March 25, 2014
SB1383 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1383 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB1383 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1383 Amended June 16, 2014
SB1383 Amended March 25, 2014
SB1383 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare