|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6121.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3592.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|