California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 20, 2014
Bill May 14, 2014