|
09/29/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4990.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly amendments were concurred in. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4645.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6152.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 3435.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3308.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|