California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014
Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 12, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 23, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014