|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4913.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6451.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|