California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1409 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/25/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1409CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 563 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 25, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 27, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 4, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to add Section 915 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1409, Hill. Public Utilities Commission: safety investigations. The California Constitution establishes the Public Utilities Commission with regulatory authority over public utilities and authorizes the commission to establish its own procedures, subject to statutory limitations or directions and constitutional requirements of due process. The Public Utilities Act requires the commission to publish and maintain certain documents and information and make specified materials available on the commission's Internet Web site. The act requires the commission to submit certain information about its activities to the Governor and the Legislature no later than February 1 of each year, including a work plan describing its scheduled ratemaking proceedings, an accounting of its transactions and proceedings, and a report on the number of cases where resolution of the case exceeded the time periods prescribed in scoping memos and on the number of days that commissioners presided in hearings. This bill would require the commission, beginning February 1, 2016, to annually publish a report that includes all investigations into gas or electric service safety incidents reported, pursuant to commission requirements, by any gas corporation or electrical corporation including the month of the safety incident, the reason for the investigation, the facility type involved, and the owner of the facility. The bill would require that the report succinctly describe safety investigations concluded during the prior calendar year and investigations that remain open. The bill would require that the work plan submitted to the Governor and the Legislature include a summary of staff safety investigations concluded during the prior calendar year and staff safety investigations that remain open for any gas corporation or electrical corporation, with a link to the Internet Web site with the report that contains the above-described information that the commission is required to annually report. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 915 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 915. (a) Beginning February 1, 2016, the commission shall annually publish a report that includes all investigations into gas or electric service safety incidents reported, pursuant to commission requirements, by any gas corporation or electrical corporation. The report shall succinctly describe each safety investigation concluded during the prior calendar year and each investigation that remains open. The categories within the description shall include the month of the safety incident, the reason for the investigation, the facility type involved, and the owner of the facility. (b) The commission shall include in its work plan required pursuant Section 321.6, a summary of the staff safety investigations concluded during the prior calendar year and the staff safety investigations that remain open for any gas corporation or electrical corporation, with a link to the Internet Web site with the report that contains the information required pursuant to subdivision (a).