|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 323, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 6155.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 3494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|