BILL NUMBER: SB 1430CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 323 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 15, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 19, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 25, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 602.4 of the Penal Code, relating to malicious mischief, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1430, Hill. Malicious mischief: airport property: transportation services. Existing law provides that a person who enters or remains on airport property owned by a city, county, or city and county, but located in another county, and sells, peddles, or offers for sale any goods, merchandise, property, or services of any kind whatsoever, including transportation services on or from the airport property, to members of the public without the express written consent of the governing board of the airport property, or its duly authorized representative, is guilty of a misdemeanor. This bill would additionally provide that a person who offers for sale transportation services to the airport property to members of the public without written consent is also guilty of that crime. The bill would also make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions. By expanding the scope of an existing crime, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 602.4 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 602.4. (a) A person who enters or remains on airport property owned by a city, county, or city and county, but located in another county, and sells, peddles, or offers for sale any goods, merchandise, property, or services of any kind whatsoever, including transportation services to, on, or from the airport property, to members of the public without the express written consent of the governing board of the airport property, or its duly authorized representative, is guilty of a misdemeanor. (b) Nothing in this section affects the power of a county, city, or city and county to regulate the sale, peddling, or offering for sale of goods, merchandise, property, or services. (c) For purposes of this section, when a charter-party carrier licensed by the Public Utilities Commission operates at an airport on a prearranged basis, as defined in Section 5360.5 of the Public Utilities Code, that operation shall not constitute the sale, peddling, or offering of goods, merchandise, property, or services. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: To quickly remedy a technical ambiguity in existing law that poses an immediate threat to public safety and frustrates effective enforcement by permitting individuals to conduct unauthorized commercial activities on municipal airport roadways and property, where those airports must have clear authority to enforce laws related to commercial activities on airport premises, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.