|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 929, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6640.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on TRANS.) suspended. (Page 5545.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3412.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|