California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1433 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/30/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1433CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 929 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 30, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 29, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 7, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Section 20209.14 of the Public Contract Code, relating to transit contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1433, Hill. Local Agency Public Construction Act: transit design-build contracts. The Local Agency Public Construction Act until January 1, 2015, authorizes a transit operator, as defined, to enter into a design-build contract, as specified. Existing law requires certain information submitted in this regard to be provided under penalty of perjury. This bill would extend the authorization for a transit operator to enter into a design-build contract until January 1, 2017. Because the bill would expand the crime of perjury, it would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 20209.14 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 20209.14. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2017, and as of that date is repealed. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.