|
09/30/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2014
|
In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 6755.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3613.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3717.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|