LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1442
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1442
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1442
Compare Versions
SB1442 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB1442 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1442 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1442 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1442 Amended May 12, 2014
SB1442 Amended March 27, 2014
SB1442 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1442 Enrolled September 5, 2014
SB1442 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1442 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1442 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1442 Amended May 12, 2014
SB1442 Amended March 27, 2014
SB1442 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare