|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4294.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5706.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3257.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|