California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 6, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 10, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014