|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 442, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4698.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4671.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6168.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|