LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1465
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1465
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1465
Compare Versions
SB1465 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB1465 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1465 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1465 Amended June 11, 2014
SB1465 Introduced March 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1465 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB1465 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1465 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1465 Amended June 11, 2014
SB1465 Introduced March 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare