Assembly
|
08/27/2013
|
Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 755.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 566.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|