LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB15
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB15
Compare Versions
SB15 Amended August 6, 2013
SB15 Amended June 27, 2013
SB15 Amended June 12, 2013
SB15 Amended May 24, 2013
SB15 Amended April 22, 2013
SB15 Amended April 1, 2013
SB15 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB15 Amended August 6, 2013
SB15 Amended June 27, 2013
SB15 Amended June 12, 2013
SB15 Amended May 24, 2013
SB15 Amended April 22, 2013
SB15 Amended April 1, 2013
SB15 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare