|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 575, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2366.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 3134.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2939.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 14. Page 2289.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2245.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 863.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 785.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|