LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB150
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB150
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB150
Compare Versions
SB150 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB150 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB150 Amended September 6, 2013
SB150 Amended July 1, 2013
SB150 Amended April 25, 2013
SB150 Amended March 14, 2013
SB150 Introduced January 31, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB150 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB150 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB150 Amended September 6, 2013
SB150 Amended July 1, 2013
SB150 Amended April 25, 2013
SB150 Amended March 14, 2013
SB150 Introduced January 31, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare