|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 443, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2034.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 2723.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|