California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013