|
07/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2132.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 808.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 665.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|