California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 25, 2013

Chaptered

Bill July 3, 2013

Amended

Bill May 1, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013