|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2035.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2711.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 577.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 291.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|